Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Food Service Facilities - Automated External Defibrillator Program (The Joe Sheya Act)
Sponsored by
Senators Raskin, Klausmeier, Astle, Benson, Conway, Feldman, Guzzone, Hershey, Jennings, Kelley, King, Lee, Madaleno, Mathias, Middleton, Peters, Pugh, Reilly, and Rosapepe
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the owner and operator of a food service facility with an annual gross income of $400,000 or more and a seating capacity of 50 or more persons to develop and, beginning on October 1, 2017, to implement an automated external defibrillator program that meets specified requirements; and requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene and the Maryland Institute for Emergency Medical Services Systems jointly to adopt specified regulations.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1194
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {447875/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-6)
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2016 2/01/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/02/2016 2/02/2016 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2016 2/22/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Favorable with Amendments {447875/1 Report Adopted 29
Senate 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 29
Senate 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (41-6) 31
House 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations 32
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-330.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM