Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Actions - Damages for Crimes Against Vulnerable or Elderly Adults - Standing
Sponsored by
Senators Frosh, Forehand, and Stone
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Attorney General to bring a civil action for damages against a person who violates specified provisions of criminal law on behalf of a specified person; providing that a specified criminal conviction is not a prerequisite for maintenance of an action under the Act; providing that the Attorney General may recover specified damages under the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0724
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2014 1/24/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-604, 3-605, 8-801 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM