Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Caroline County, Dorchester County, and Kent County – Sheriffs’ Salaries
Sponsored by
Caroline County Senators
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 821
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the salary of the Sheriff of Caroline County to be equal to 80% of the salary of the State's Attorney for Caroline County; altering the salary of the Sheriff of Kent County to be equal to 80% of the salary of the State's Attorney for Kent County; altering the salary of the Sheriff of Dorchester County to be equal to 80% of the salary of the State's Attorney for Dorchester County; and applying the Act.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0554
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Caroline County - Sheriff Salary
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {808870/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Eckardt) Adopted
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {343320/1 (Senator Eckardt) Adopted
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-1)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2018
Legislative Date
5/26/2018
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 821
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Caroline County - Sheriff Salary
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Favorable with Amendments {808870/1 Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Eckardt) Adopted 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Floor Amendment {343320/1 (Senator Eckardt) Adopted 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Caroline County, Dorchester County, and Kent County – Sheriffs’ Salaries
Senate 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Referred Environment and Transportation 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (139-1) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Returned Passed 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/26/2018 5/26/2018 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 821
Text - Chapter - Caroline County, Dorchester County, and Kent County – Sheriffs’ Salaries
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page