Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Security
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, Beidle, Feldman, and Hershey
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 472
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing that the owner of a rental vehicle may satisfy a certain insurance requirement by maintaining a certain security that is secondary to any other valid and collectible coverage under certain circumstances and subject to a certain exception; providing that security maintained by the owner of a rental vehicle or replacement vehicle is primary under certain circumstances; requiring the owner of a rental vehicle to provide a certain notice to the renter of the rental vehicle; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1003
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0573 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Security
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {587777/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Security
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
4/06/2019
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (106-24)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 472
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Security
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Security
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable with Amendments {587777/1 Adopted 61
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Security
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 62
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 65
House 4/06/2019 4/06/2019 Rereferred to Economic Matters
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 67
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (106-24) 68
Senate 4/08/2019 4/03/2019 Returned Passed 66
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 472
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Security
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-103, 17-104, 17-104.3, 18-102, 18-106 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM