Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Municipal Elections - Inclusion of Offices and Questions on the State Ballot
Sponsored by
Senator Mathias
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 501
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a municipality to request that the State Board of Elections include specified offices and questions on a specified ballot; requiring a municipality to file a specified request with the State Board on or before a specified date; requiring a municipality to include a certification as part of a request; providing that a municipality is not required to file a specified request under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {204330/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {435261/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 501
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2014 1/24/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/24/2014 1/24/2014 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/27/2014 3/03/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments {204330/1 Report Adopted 38
Senate 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38
Senate 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 40
House 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 First Reading Ways and Means 43
House 3/11/2014 3/11/2014 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable with Amendments {435261/1 Report Adopted 61
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) 63
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendments 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Passed Enrolled 60
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 501
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-101, 7-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM