Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Electronic Telecommunications Enforcement Resource System - Body Attachments
Sponsored by
Senator Norman
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of State Police to cooperate with certain entities to incorporate body attachments into the Maryland Electronic Telecommunications Enforcement Resource System (METERS); establishing that clerks of the courts and appropriate local law enforcement agencies are responsible for certain activities related to body attachments entered in METERS; authorizing a judge or law enforcement agency or officer to access METERS to determine the status of certain outstanding body attachments; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Public Safety - Maryland Electronic Telecommunications Enforcement Resource System - Body Attachments
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Second Reading Passed 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Safety - Maryland Electronic Telecommunications Enforcement Resource System - Body Attachments
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Judiciary 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
(   2-304, 2-305 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page