Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Use or Possession of a Controlled Dangerous Substance - De Minimis Quantity
Sponsored by
Senator Astle
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Making certain violations relating to the use or possession of certain de minimis quantities of certain controlled dangerous substances a civil offense rather than a misdemeanor; applying penalties for a first or second finding of guilt involving the use or possession of less than 10 grams of marijuana to a first or second finding of guilt involving the use or possession of a de minimis quantity of certain controlled dangerous substances; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0325
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Law - Use or Possession of a Controlled Dangerous Substance - De Minimis Quantity
Senate 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-601, 5-601.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM