Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Ethics - Members of the General Assembly - Presumption of a Conflict - Clients
Sponsored by
Senators Conway and Dyson
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "close economic association" in the Public Ethics Law to include the client of a legislator or a client of a partnership, limited liability partnership, or limited liability corporation in which the legislator knowingly has invested capital or owns an interest; and generally relating to public ethics, members of the General Assembly, and presumptions of conflicts.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {364630/1
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
Special Order until 2/18 (Senator Dyson) Adopted
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {364630/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Dyson) {853220/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2014
Legislative Date
2/20/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/21/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2014 1/24/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/24/2014 1/24/2014 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/12/2014 2/13/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 Favorable with Amendments {364630/1 26
Senate 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 Special Order until 2/18 (Senator Dyson) Adopted 26
Senate 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Favorable with Amendments {364630/1 Report Adopted 28
Senate 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Dyson) {853220/1 Adopted 28
Senate 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28
Senate 2/20/2014 2/20/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 30
House 2/21/2014 2/21/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters 33
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-512, 5-513 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM