Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Care Provider Malpractice Insurance - Scope of Coverage
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Reilly, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Klausmeier, Mathias, Middleton, and Pugh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 209
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the inclusion, in a policy that insures a health care provider against damages due to medical injury arising from providing or failing to provide health care, of coverage for the defense of a health care provider in a specified disciplinary hearing if the cost of the included coverage is itemized in the billing statement, invoice, or declarations page for the policy and reported to the Maryland Insurance Commissioner in a form and manner required by the Commissioner.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1487
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0569 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {737874/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
29
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 209
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2016 2/02/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/02/2016 2/02/2016 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/17/2016 2/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 Favorable with Amendments {737874/1 Report Adopted 27
Senate 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 27
Senate 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 29
House 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 First Reading Economic Matters 31
House 4/06/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 63
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed 63
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 64
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 209
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM