Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Group Health Benefit Plans - Renewal Premium Rate Calculation Statement
Sponsored by
Senator Serafini
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified health insurance carriers to provide to the policyholder or plan sponsor of a group health benefit plan a renewal premium rate calculation statement at least 90 days before the date of renewal of the group health benefit plan; requiring the statement to include specified information; and applying the Act to all group health benefit plans issued, delivered, or renewed in the State on or after October 1, 2016.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0025
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2016 2/02/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/02/2016 2/02/2016 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/09/2016 3/10/2016 Unfavorable Report by Finance
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-1408 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM