Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Marijuana and Drug Paraphernalia - Medical Necessity
Sponsored by
Senators Zirkin and Raskin
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a court to dismiss a specified possession of marijuana charge if the court finds that the person used or possessed marijuana because of medical necessity; requiring a court to dismiss a specified possession of drug paraphernalia charge related to marijuana if the court finds that the person possessed the drug paraphernalia related to marijuana because of medical necessity; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-34)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/12/2015 3/13/2015 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 43
Senate 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 Second Reading Passed 43
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 First Reading Judiciary 45A
House 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/10/2015 4/10/2015 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/10/2015 4/05/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 66
House 4/10/2015 4/05/2015 Second Reading Passed 66
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Third Reading Passed (100-34) 67
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-601, 5-619 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM