Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Expenses
Sponsored by
Senator McFadden
Status
In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying that specified costs incurred by the holder of a tax sale certificate shall be reimbursed on redemption of the property; providing that the holder of a tax sale certificate shall be reimbursed $500 for attorney's fees if an action to foreclose the right of redemption has not been filed and establishing that amount as reasonable; altering the amount of attorney's fees that the holder of a tax sale certificate shall be reimbursed if an action to foreclose the right of redemption has been filed; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1144 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2016 2/02/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/16/2016 2/16/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/22/2016 3/22/2016 Hearing cancelled
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-833, 14-843 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM