Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Liability Insurance - Reservation of Rights for Failure to Cooperate - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Senator Zirkin
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting an insurer from disclaiming coverage under a policy of liability insurance on the ground that the insured or a specified person has breached the policy by failing to cooperate with the insurer or by not giving the insurer required notice.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/17/2015 2/18/2015 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/17/2015 3/18/2015 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-110 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM