Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Bail Bond - Installment Contract - Form and Confessed Judgment Prohibition
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman, Middleton, Astle, Benson, Hershey, Jennings, Klausmeier, Mathias, Reilly, Rosapepe, and Oaks
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 807
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring an agreement to accept payment for the premium charged for a bail bond in installments to be in a form approved by the Maryland Insurance Commissioner; prohibiting the agreement from including a confessed judgment clause that waives a consumer's right to assert a specified defense; prohibiting a bail bondsman from including a specified confessed judgment clause that waives a consumer's right to assert a specified defense in an agreement to accept payment for the premium charged for a bail bond in installments; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1494
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2017
Legislative Date
1/31/2017
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Bail Bond - Installment Contract - Confessed Judgment Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {427573/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-3)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Vallario) Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 04/10 (Delegate Barron) Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-3)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2017
Legislative Date
5/27/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 807
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/31/2017 1/31/2017 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Bail Bond - Installment Contract - Confessed Judgment Prohibition
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/23/2017 3/23/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/23/2017 3/21/2017 Favorable with Amendments {427573/1 Adopted 50
Senate 3/23/2017 3/21/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Text - Third - Bail Bond - Installment Contract - Form and Confessed Judgment Prohibition
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Third Reading Passed (44-3) 51
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 55
House 4/04/2017 4/05/2017 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable 65
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Vallario) Adopted 65
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Favorable 66
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Motion Special Order until 04/10 (Delegate Barron) Adopted 66
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 67
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Third Reading Passed (134-3) 69
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 807
Text - Chapter - Bail Bond - Installment Contract - Form and Confessed Judgment Prohibition
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-309, 27-201, 27-225 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM