Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Plumbing and Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Inspectors - Qualifications
Sponsored by
Senator Conway (By Request - Baltimore City Administration)
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Providing an exception to the authority of a county or local government to employ only plumbing inspectors who hold a master plumbing license issued by specified entities; authorizing a county or local government to hire plumbing inspectors who obtain certification by the International Code Council as a mechanical inspector within 6 months of being hired; providing that plumbing and HVAC inspectors must have at least 5 years of experience before being appointed or employed; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0405
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Plumbing and Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Inspectors - Qualifications
Senate 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM