Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Racing Commission - Equine Medical Director - Employment and Costs
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier and Smith
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Racing Commission to employ an equine medical director; and requiring the Commission to direct that thoroughbred and standardbred track licensees, thoroughbred and standardbred owners and trainers, and thoroughbred and standardbred breeders pay the cost of employing the equine medical director based on a certain percentage.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0421
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0578 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - State Racing Commission - Equine Medical Director - Employment and Costs
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM