Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Maryland Nonprofit Development Center Program and Fund - Bridge Loans
Sponsored by
Senators Kagan, Astle, Bates, Benson, Cassilly, Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Eckardt, Edwards, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Miller, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Norman, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Ready, Reilly, Robinson, Rosapepe, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, Smith, Waugh, Young, Zirkin, Zucker, Oaks, Kasemeyer, and Brochin
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 629
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Renaming the Maryland Not-For-Profit Development Center Program and the Maryland Not-For-Profit Development Center Program Fund to be the Maryland Nonprofit Development Center Program and the Maryland Nonprofit Development Center Program Fund; establishing the Nonprofit, Interest-Free, Micro Bridge Loan (NIMBL) Account within the Fund; authorizing the Governor to transfer specified funds by June 30, 2017, to the NIMBL Account; requiring the Department of Commerce to submit a specified report on the bridge loans by December 31, 2020; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1517
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2017
Legislative Date
1/31/2017
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Nonprofit Development Center Program and Fund - Bridge Loans
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {397774/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Nonprofit Development Center Program and Fund - Bridge Loans
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {643990/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (71-45)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 629
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/31/2017 1/31/2017 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Nonprofit Development Center Program and Fund - Bridge Loans
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Favorable with Amendments {397774/1 Adopted 28
Senate 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28
Text - Third - Maryland Nonprofit Development Center Program and Fund - Bridge Loans
Senate 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 30
House 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Referred Economic Matters 33
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments {643990/1 Adopted 65
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (71-45) 68
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Nonprofit Development Center Program and Fund - Bridge Loans
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 629
Text - Chapter - Maryland Nonprofit Development Center Program and Fund - Bridge Loans
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-1201 through 5-1205 )
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:35 AM