Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Mental Health - Assent to and Certificates for Admission - Licensed Certified Social Worker-Clinical and Licensed Clinical Professional Counselor
Sponsored by
Senator West
Status
In the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a requirement that assent be given for the voluntary admission of a minor to certain facilities by providing that assent may be given by a physician and a licensed certified social worker-clinical or by a physician and a licensed clinical professional counselor; altering the requirement that a certificate for involuntary admission must be based on the personal examination of a physician and a licensed certified social worker-clinical or by a physician and a licensed clinical professional counselor; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0689
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2021
Legislative Date
1/24/2021
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {637670/1 Adopted
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
18AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Certificates for Involuntary Admission – Licensed Certified Social Worker–Clinical
Senate 1/24/2021 1/24/2021 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/26/2021 2/16/2021 Favorable with Amendments {637670/1 Adopted 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2021 2/16/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Mental Health - Assent to and Certificates for Admission - Licensed Certified Social Worker-Clinical and Licensed Clinical Professional Counselor
Senate 3/02/2021 2/17/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 18AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2021 2/27/2021 Referred Health and Government Operations 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 3/4/2021 1:53 PM
Click to return on the top page