Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington County - Off-Road Vehicle Trails - Prohibition of Establishment on Sideling Hill
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 505
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Department of Natural Resources from establishing an off-road vehicle trail on State-owned property located in Sideling Hill in Washington County, including the Sideling Hill Wildlife Management Area and specified other areas; requiring the Department to review and evaluate, regarding its suitability for preservation, the Sideling Hill Wildlife Management Area and State-owned property in the areas of Sideling Hill; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0420
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Special Order until 2/26 (Senator Edwards) Adopted
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Edwards) {883823/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 505
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2014 1/27/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/21/2014 2/24/2014 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Favorable 33
Senate 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Special Order until 2/26 (Senator Edwards) Adopted 33
Senate 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 34
Senate 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Edwards) {883823/1 Adopted 34
Senate 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34
Senate 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 36
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters 39
House 3/27/2014 3/27/2014 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2014 4/03/2014 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 63
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Second Reading Passed 63
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 64
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 505
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-410, 5-209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM