Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Children - Records Access
Sponsored by
Senator Jones-Rodwell (By Request - Baltimore City Administration)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 474
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing access to specified court records and police records by the Baltimore City Health Department's Office of Youth Violence Prevention and the Baltimore City Mayor's Office on Criminal Justice under specified circumstances; requiring that the Baltimore City Health Department's Office of Youth Violence Prevention and the Baltimore City Mayor's Office on Criminal Justice be liable for the unauthorized release of police records accessed under specified circumstances; requiring a specified report within 180 days; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0588
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {938676/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {462910/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 474
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2013 1/30/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Favorable with Amendments {938676/1 Report Adopted 43
Senate 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Senate 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45
House 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 First Reading Judiciary 47
House 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Favorable with Amendments {462910/1 Report Adopted 58
House 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0) 60
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Senate Concur - House Amendments 60
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 60
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Passed Enrolled 60
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 474
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-202, 9-219 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM