Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Frederick County - Deer Hunting - Sundays
Sponsored by
Senators Edwards, Shank, and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 507
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to allow a person to hunt deer on a Sunday on specified property from the first Sunday in October through the second Sunday in January of the following year, inclusive, in Frederick County, subject to specified provisions of law.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0432
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/20/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/21/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {744335/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/21/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {160915/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (119-15)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 507
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2014 1/27/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2014 2/20/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/21/2014 2/21/2014 Favorable with Amendments {744335/1 Report Adopted 31
Senate 2/21/2014 2/21/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31
Senate 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 33
House 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters 36
House 3/27/2014 3/27/2014 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable with Amendments {160915/1 Report Adopted 64
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (119-15) 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendments 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Passed Enrolled 62
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 507
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM