Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Discrimination in Employment - Reasonable Accommodations for Applicants With Disabilities
Sponsored by
Senators Lam, Carter, Feldman, Lee, Patterson, and Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting an employer from failing or refusing to make a reasonable accommodation for the known disability of an otherwise qualified applicant for employment; and expanding a certain undue hardship exception for employers regarding provision of a certain reasonable accommodation to include certain qualified disabled applicants for employment.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0312
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Discrimination in Employment - Reasonable Accommodations for Applicants With Disabilities
Senate 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   20-603, 20-606 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:06 PM
Click to return on the top page