Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
Veto sustained (0-44)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering specified requirements for the resident agent of a Maryland corporation, a limited partnership, and a Maryland statutory trust; prohibiting the charter or bylaws of a corporation with capital stock from imposing liability on a specified stockholder for the attorney's fees or expenses of the corporation or any other party in connection with an internal corporate claim; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0744
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {988378/1
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/8 (Senator Serafini) Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {988378/1 Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-1)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2017
Legislative Date
5/26/2017
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
Veto sustained (0-44)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments {988378/1 38
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/8 (Senator Serafini) Adopted 38
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Favorable with Amendments {988378/1 Adopted 39
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39
Text - Third - Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions
Senate 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 41
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Referred Economic Matters 43
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/27/2017 3/22/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-1) 57
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 5/26/2017 5/26/2017 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter
Senate 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 Veto sustained (0-44)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-104, 1-101, 1-203, 12-203, 1-301, 2-108, 2-113, 2-212, 2-514, 3-507, 3-515, 5-207, 8-601.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM