Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Law Enforcement Officers - Body-Worn Digital Recording Device and Electronic Control Device
Sponsored by
Senators Ramirez, Madaleno, Montgomery, Raskin, Waugh, Zirkin, Gladden, Muse, and Klausmeier
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 128
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing that it is lawful under a specified provision of law for a law enforcement officer to intercept a specified oral communication with a specified device under specified circumstances; requiring on or before January 1, 2016, the Maryland Police Training Commission to develop and publish online a policy for the issuance and use of a body-worn camera by a law enforcement officer; establishing the Commission Regarding the Implementation and Use of Body Cameras by Law Enforcement Officers; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0627
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {228574/1
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Special Order until 4/11 (Senator Astle) Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {228574/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Astle) {543628/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Zirkin) {133225/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Klausmeier) {313220/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Pugh) {603520/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Ramirez) Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Manno) {633124/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (125-12)
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 128
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/09/2015 4/10/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments {228574/1 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Special Order until 4/11 (Senator Astle) Adopted 61
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Favorable with Amendments {228574/1 Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Astle) {543628/1 Adopted 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Zirkin) {133225/1 Adopted 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Klausmeier) {313220/1 Adopted 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Pugh) {603520/1 Adopted 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Special Order until later today (Senator Ramirez) Adopted 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Manno) {633124/1 Adopted 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 68
House 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 70
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Second Reading Passed 70
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 Third Reading Passed (125-12) 72
Senate 4/14/2015 4/10/2015 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 128
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM