Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Remote Access Information Program for Deaf-Blind Individuals - Establishment
Sponsored by
Senators Astle, Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Eckardt, Edwards, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Kagan, Klausmeier, Lee, Manno, McFadden, Peters, Reilly, Rosapepe, Serafini, Smith, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Remote Access Information Program for Deaf-Blind Individuals to use remote assistive technology to connect certain deaf-blind individuals with a human assistant to provide real-time information that would not otherwise be available; requiring the Department of Information Technology to consult with the Department of Disabilities to establish and administer the Program and adopt certain regulations; requiring a certain annual payment to the Department of Disabilities; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
Reassigned to Finance
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - Remote Access Information Program for Deaf-Blind Individuals - Establishment
Senate 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 Reassigned to Finance 18
Senate 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3A-801 through 3A-803 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM