Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Excise Tax Exemptions - Leased Vehicles
Sponsored by
Senator McFadden
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting specified leased vehicles from the excise tax imposed on the issuance of a certificate of title.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0721
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2013 1/31/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-809, 13-810 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM