Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Research and Development Expenses - Credit Amounts
Sponsored by
Senators King, Feldman, Peters, Currie, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kasemeyer, Madaleno, Manno, and McFadden
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing the maximum total amount of research and development tax credits that the Department of Business and Economic Development may approve; and applying the Act to all Maryland research and development tax credits certified after December 15, 2014.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {699630/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/30/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/31/2015 3/26/2015 Favorable with Amendments {699630/1 Report Adopted 53
Senate 3/31/2015 3/26/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53
Senate 4/01/2015 3/27/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 54
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 58
House 4/11/2015 4/11/2015 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/11/2015 4/11/2015 Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-721 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM