Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law – Domestic Violence – Permanent Protective Orders
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Conway, Currie, Eckardt, Feldman, Guzzone, Lee, Nathan-Pulliam, Peters, Ready, Robinson, Smith, Young, Zucker, Brochin, Cassilly, Hough, Muse, Norman, Ramirez, and Zirkin
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 426
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the circumstances under which the court is required to issue a certain permanent protective order; and requiring the court to issue a permanent protective order against a certain individual if, during the term of a certain protective order, the individual committed an act of abuse against a certain person eligible for relief under certain circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1303
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Family Law – Domestic Violence – Permanent Protective Orders
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {908077/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Family Law – Domestic Violence – Permanent Protective Orders
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 426
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Family Law – Domestic Violence – Permanent Protective Orders
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Family Law – Domestic Violence – Permanent Protective Orders
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {908077/1 Adopted 35
Senate 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
Text - Third - Family Law – Domestic Violence – Permanent Protective Orders
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 37
House 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Referred Judiciary 38
House 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 4/03/2018 4/03/2018 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 426
Text - Chapter - Family Law – Domestic Violence – Permanent Protective Orders
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-506 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM