Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - School Construction Master Plan Workgroup - Reporting and Sunset Extension PG 510-19
Sponsored by
Senators Rosapepe and Peters
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Prince George's County School Construction Master Plan Workgroup to report certain findings and recommendations and to provide a status report on the implementation of certain recommendations to certain entities on or before December 31, 2019, and December 31, 2020; and extending the termination date for the Workgroup to June 30, 2021.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0498
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Prince George's County - School Construction Master Plan Workgroup - Reporting and Sunset Extension PG 510-19
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM