Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Assembly Members - Business Communications as Private Citizens - Notice
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh, Benson, Conway, Jones-Rodwell, Kelley, King, Montgomery, and Muse
Status
In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a member of the General Assembly who is self-employed, a consultant to a business entity doing business in the State, or an independent contractor who contracts with a business entity doing business in the State to include in a business communication a specified statement; and defining the term "business communication".
Committees
Original:
Rules
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0381
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/05/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2013 1/31/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 Hearing 2/05 at 11:00 a.m.
Senate 2/05/2013 2/05/2013 Hearing cancelled
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM