Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Behavioral Health Community Providers - Keep the Door Open Act
Sponsored by
Senators Guzzone, Astle, Benson, Conway, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Kagan, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Nathan-Pulliam, Peters, Pinsky, Pugh, Ramirez, Raskin, Rosapepe, Waugh, Young, Zirkin, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-1)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring, except under specified circumstances, the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to adjust the rate of reimbursement for community providers each fiscal year by the rate adjustment included in the State budget; requiring, on or before December 1, 2018, and on December 1 annually thereafter, the Department to submit a report to the Governor and General Assembly on the impact of the reimbursement rate adjustment required under the Act on community providers and other specified outcomes; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0595
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {277873/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (35-9)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {326786/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-1)
Proceedings
70
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2016 2/03/2016 First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Senate 3/17/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments {277873/1 Report Adopted 47
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (35-9) 48
House 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations 51
House 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable with Amendments {326786/1 Report Adopted 69
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 69
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-1) 70
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-201.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM