Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification and Credit - Creation of a Qualifying Business Enterprise
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh, Benson, Conway, Forehand, Garagiola, Jones-Rodwell, and McFadden
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for income related to the qualifying sale of a business enterprise that results in the creation of a specified business enterprise owned and controlled by specified individuals; allowing investors in specified business enterprises to claim a credit against the State income tax for specified investments; providing for the recapture of the subtraction modification and tax credit under specified circumstances; applying the Act to tax years beginning after December 31, 2012; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0564
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2013 1/31/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/28/2013 2/28/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/06/2013 3/07/2013 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-205, 10-207, 10-306, 10-307, 10-733 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM