Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Hit and Run Suspects - Yellow Alert Program
Sponsored by
Senators Simonaire, Brochin, Cassilly, Hough, Muse, Norman, Ready, and Smith
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of State Police to recruit public and commercial television and radio broadcasters, local volunteer groups, social media experts, and other members of the public on an ongoing basis to assist in updating and improving the Yellow Alert Program; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Hit and Run Suspects - Yellow Alert Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {268477/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Safety - Hit and Run Suspects - Yellow Alert Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/18/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
51
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Public Safety - Hit and Run Suspects - Yellow Alert Program
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {268477/1 Adopted 48B
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48B
Text - Third - Public Safety - Hit and Run Suspects - Yellow Alert Program
Senate 3/20/2018 3/18/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 49
House 3/21/2018 3/17/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 51
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM