Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Grounds for Divorce
Sponsored by
Senator Zirkin
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that, for purposes of granting a limited or an absolute divorce, parties may be considered to be living separate and apart without cohabitation even if the parties share living expenses and a residence, as long as the parties maintain separate bedrooms; and establishing that specified third party corroboration is not necessary under the Act.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0748
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {478971/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-1)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2013 1/31/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2013 3/12/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Favorable with Amendments {478971/1 Report Adopted 44
Senate 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Senate 3/15/2013 3/15/2013 Third Reading Passed (40-1) 46
House 3/18/2013 3/15/2013 First Reading Judiciary 48A
House 3/19/2013 3/19/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2013 3/29/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-102, 7-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM