Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Bail Bonds - Cash Bail
Sponsored by
Senator Zirkin
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 487
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing in circuit courts and in the District Court cash bail or cash bond to be posted by the defendant, by an individual, or by a specified private surety acting for the defendant under specified circumstances; requiring cash bail or cash bond to be posted by the defendant only, unless the order setting bail expressly provides otherwise, in cases involving a defendant's failure to pay support to specified individuals; and providing for the repeal of laws inconsistent with the Act.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0777
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0492 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-2)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {582810/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 487
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2013 1/31/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2013 3/18/2013 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/19/2013 3/17/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 48
Senate 3/19/2013 3/17/2013 Second Reading Passed 48
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 Third Reading Passed (43-2) 50
House 3/21/2013 3/18/2013 First Reading Judiciary 51
House 3/26/2013 3/26/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable with Amendments {582810/1 Report Adopted 61
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Senate Concur - House Amendment 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Passed Enrolled 63
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 487
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-203, 5-205 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM