Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Strong Manufacturing Development Act
Sponsored by
Senators Manno, DeGrange, Edwards, Kagan, Klausmeier, Peters, Ramirez, Salling, Waugh, Young, and Serafini
Status
In the Senate - Referred to interim study by Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Manufacturing Development Zone Program to encourage business entities engaged in manufacturing outside the State to invest in manufacturing facilities within the State; authorizing specified political subdivisions to apply to have specified areas of the State designated as a manufacturing development zone; requiring a county or municipal corporation to grant a specified property tax credit; authorizing specified business entities to claim a specified credit against the State income tax; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Referred to interim study by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/02/2015 4/03/2015 Referred to interim study by Budget and Taxation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-102, 5-1501 through 5-1507 )
(   10-737 )
(   9-103.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM