Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Savings Accounts – Establishment and Application of Trust Law
Sponsored by
Senator West
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 617
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the establishment of a certain health savings account; providing that certain provisions of law do not apply to certain health savings accounts; providing that a health savings account is established on the first day that an individual becomes covered under a high deductible health plan; requiring a health savings account to be opened with a trustee or custodian within a certain time period; and clarifying that a health savings account is established regardless of certain circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Judiciary
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0671
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Estates and Trusts - Health Savings Accounts - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {417670/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Health Savings Accounts – Establishment and Application of Trust Law
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2020
Legislative Date
2/26/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
49B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 617
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Estates and Trusts - Health Savings Accounts - Establishment
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable with Amendments {417670/1 Adopted 34
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34
Text - Third - Health Savings Accounts – Establishment and Application of Trust Law
Senate 2/26/2020 2/26/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 36
House 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Referred Judiciary 37
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 49B
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 617
Text - Chapter - Health Savings Accounts – Establishment and Application of Trust Law
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-144 )
Last Updated: 7/9/2020 1:17 PM