Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Children - Child Care Facilities, Public Schools, and Nonpublic Schools - Contractors and Subcontractors
Sponsored by
Senators Hough, Cassilly, King, Lee, Ramirez, Raskin, Waugh, and Ready
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting specified county boards of education and specified nonpublic schools from hiring or retaining specified individuals who have been convicted of specified crimes; requiring specified contracts to provide that specified contractors or subcontractors for specified nonpublic schools and specified local school systems may not knowingly assign employees to work on school premises with direct, unsupervised, and uncontrolled access to children if the employee has been convicted of a specified crime; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0642
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {814233/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {125366/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Favorable with Amendments {814233/1 Report Adopted 44
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 First Reading Ways and Means 45A
House 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/02/2015 3/29/2015 Favorable with Amendments {125366/1 Report Adopted 59
House 4/02/2015 3/29/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0) 60
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 Senate Concur - House Amendments 59
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 Passed Enrolled 59
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-206.1, 6-113 )
(   5-560, 5-561 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM