Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Remedies for Shoplifting and Employee Theft
Sponsored by
Senators Ramirez, Norman, and Ferguson
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 679
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing a specified provision of law providing that a responsible person is civilly liable to a merchant for specified civil penalties for shoplifting and employee theft; altering requirements for specified demand letters relating to alleged acts of shoplifting or employee theft; providing that a responsible person who prevails in a specified civil action is entitled to an award of court costs and reasonable attorney's fees, under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0190
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {368978/1
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {368978/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {513328/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {912218/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (86-52)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Senators Ramirez, Brochin, and Norman
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
House Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Delegates Smith, Morales, and Sanchez
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (86-55)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/28/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 679
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Favorable with Amendments {368978/1 44
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted 44
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Favorable with Amendments {368978/1 Report Adopted 45
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {513328/1 Adopted 45
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 46
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 First Reading Judiciary 47
House 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments {912218/1 Report Adopted 60
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (86-52) 61
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments 62
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Senate Requests House Recede 62
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 62
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Senators Ramirez, Brochin, and Norman 62
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 House Refuses to Recede 65
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 65
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Delegates Smith, Morales, and Sanchez 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Conference Committee Report Adopted 66
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Third Reading Passed (42-0) 66
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Conference Committee Report Adopted 70
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Third Reading Passed (86-55) 70
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Passed Enrolled 70
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/28/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 679
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-1301, 3-1302, 3-1303, 3-1304, 3-1305, 3-1306, 3-1306.1, 3-1307, 3-1308, 3-1309 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM