Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Returning Heroes and Wounded Warriors
Sponsored by
Senators Currie and Peters
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a business entity to claim a credit against the State income tax for specified wages paid to specified qualified veterans; providing that the credit may not exceed a specified amount; providing for the carryforward of the credit; requiring the Comptroller to adopt specified regulations and provide a specified annual report; defining specified terms; providing for the application of the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2014 1/29/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-736 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM