Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax – In Rem Foreclosure and Sale – Vacant and Abandoned Property
Sponsored by
Senators Eckardt, Ferguson, Rosapepe, Serafini, Washington, and Salling
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 276
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a tax collector to withhold from tax sale certain real property designated by a county or municipal corporation for foreclosure and sale under a certain process; authorizing a county or municipal corporation to initiate an in rem foreclosure and sale of certain real property for delinquent taxes; authorizing a county or municipal corporation to enact laws authorizing in rem foreclosure and sale of certain real property; authorizing the county or municipal corporation to commence an in rem foreclosure action; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0557
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0954 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {149031/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Property Tax – In Rem Foreclosure – Vacant and Abandoned Property
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {575468/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-1)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 276
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Property Tax - In Rem Foreclosure and Sale - Vacant and Abandoned Property
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {149031/1 Adopted 45
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Property Tax – In Rem Foreclosure – Vacant and Abandoned Property
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 47
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Referred Ways and Means 47
House 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable with Amendments {575468/1 Adopted 64
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-1) 65
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 63
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Property Tax – In Rem Foreclosure and Sale – Vacant and Abandoned Property
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 276
Text - Chapter - Property Tax – In Rem Foreclosure and Sale – Vacant and Abandoned Property
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-801, 14-811, 14-873 through 14-876 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM