Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Taxes - Sales and Use Tax - Repeal
Sponsored by
Senator Waugh
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that the sales and use tax does not apply to the sale of electricity, fuel, and other utilities used to operate a restaurant.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
Reassigned to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 Reassigned to Budget and Taxation 18
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/15/2016 2/15/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/15/2016 2/15/2016 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/04/2016 Text - First - Taxes - Sales and Use Tax - Repeal
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-232 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM