Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
**Veto override
   SB0517 - 2015RS
   CH0004 - 2016RS
Title
Criminal Law - Use and Possession of Marijuana and Drug Paraphernalia
Sponsored by
Senator Zirkin
Status
Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 4 of 2016
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a civil penalty for the smoking of marijuana in a public place; establishing that a specified criminal prohibition on the use or possession of drug paraphernalia does not apply to the use or possession of drug paraphernalia involving the use or possession of marijuana; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {178278/2
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {178278/2 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {318871/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Madaleno) {973126/1 Rejected (8-38)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-13)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Carozza) {473927/1
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Vaughn) Adopted (86-50)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Carozza) Rejected (57-78)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Shoemaker) {533827/1
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Vaughn) Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Shoemaker) Rejected (63-73)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (83-53)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2015
Legislative Date
5/22/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Veto overridden (29-17)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Veto overridden (86-55)
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 4 of 2016
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/13/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Favorable with Amendments {178278/2 44
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 44
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Favorable with Amendments {178278/2 Report Adopted 45
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Floor Committee Amendment {318871/1 Adopted 45
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Madaleno) {973126/1 Rejected (8-38) 45
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Third Reading Passed (32-13) 47
House 3/20/2015 3/18/2015 First Reading Judiciary 48
House 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/10/2015 4/10/2015 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/10/2015 4/05/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 66
House 4/10/2015 4/05/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate Carozza) {473927/1 66
House 4/10/2015 4/05/2015 Motion vote previous question (Delegate Vaughn) Adopted (86-50) 66
House 4/10/2015 4/05/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate Carozza) Rejected (57-78) 66
House 4/10/2015 4/05/2015 Second Reading Passed 66
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate Shoemaker) {533827/1 67
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Motion vote previous question (Delegate Vaughn) Adopted 67
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate Shoemaker) Rejected (63-73) 67
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Third Reading Passed (83-53) 67
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/26/2015 5/22/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Senate 1/20/2016 1/13/2016 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Senate 1/20/2016 1/21/2016 Veto overridden (29-17)
House 1/21/2016 1/21/2016 Veto overridden (86-55)
Post Passage 1/21/2016 1/21/2016 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 4 of 2016
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-601, 5-619 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM