Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington County - Contributions to Nonprofit Organizations - Process
Sponsored by
Washington County Senators
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the process by which the County Commissioners of Washington County make contributions to specified nonprofit organizations in Washington County; altering the deadline for submission of applications for contributions; requiring the County Commissioners to hold a public hearing on the applications; authorizing the County Commissioners to remove specified organizations from a specified list and, on request by the organization, to revise or amend the name of an organization; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0867
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/29/2016 2/29/2016 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 34
Senate 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Second Reading Passed 34
Senate 3/03/2016 3/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 36
House 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation 38
House 4/04/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 63
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed 63
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 69
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Returned Passed 66
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM