Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Charitable Gaming
Sponsored by
Anne Arundel County Senators
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing specified organizations in Anne Arundel County to conduct a card game, card tournament, or casino event under specified circumstances; requiring an organization to obtain a permit from the County Department of Inspections and Permits; requiring an organization that seeks a permit to meet specified requirements; requiring an individual who participates in or volunteers as an operator of a card game, card tournament, or casino event to be at least 21 years of age; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0764
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/15/2016 2/15/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/15/2016 2/15/2016 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-401, 13-404, 13-404.1, 13-408 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM