Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Exemptions - Girl Scouts and Boy Scouts
Sponsored by
Senator Reilly
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 3:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting from the sales and use tax a sale by a chartered organization of the Boy Scouts of America established in the State, or by a troop of the Girl Scouts of the United States of America established in the State.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0719
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 3:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM