Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Sponsored by
Senators Raskin, Benson, Brochin, Guzzone, Kagan, Kelley, King, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Montgomery, and Rosapepe
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Human Resources to serve in a fiduciary capacity for children in its custody; requiring the Department, in any action, service, or decision on behalf of a child in its custody, to protect and serve the best interest of the child; requiring the Department to take specified actions when serving as a representative payee; requiring the Department to provide specified notice to the child, through the child's attorney, of specified actions taken with respect to specified benefits for the child; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0575
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0914 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/09/2015
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {378370/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/09/2015 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/26/2015 3/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments {378370/1 Report Adopted 34
Senate 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34
Senate 3/05/2015 3/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 36
House 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 First Reading Judiciary 38
House 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2015 4/03/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-527.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM