Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Agriculture - Commercial Feed - Exemption
Sponsored by
Senator Bates
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 400
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the defined term "commercial feed" as used in the Maryland Commercial Feed Law to exempt specified materials.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {854037/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 400
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments {854037/1 Report Adopted 39
Senate 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39
Senate 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 41
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation 43
House 3/21/2016 3/21/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2016 3/21/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 3/22/2016 3/21/2016 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 63
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed 63
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 68
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 400
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM