Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
**Veto override
   SB0528 - 2015RS
   CH0005 - 2016RS
Title
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture
Sponsored by
Senators Raskin, Brochin, Currie, Feldman, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Muse, Pinsky, and Zirkin
Status
Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 5 of 2016
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a minimum amount of $300 that is subject to forfeiture in connection with a controlled dangerous substance violation under specified circumstances; prohibiting a seizing authority or prosecuting authority from directly or indirectly transferring seized property to a federal law enforcement authority or agency, with a specified exception; requiring the seizing authority, within 30 days after the seizure of property, to send by first-class mail specified written information to the owner of the seized property; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0360
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {318271/1
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {318271/1
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Reilly) {823521/1 Rejected (10-36)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {572514/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (89-51)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2015
Legislative Date
5/22/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 2/5/2016 (Senator Jennings) Rejected
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Veto overridden (32-14)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Veto overridden (89-52)
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 5 of 2016
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/13/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Favorable with Amendments {318271/1 44
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted 44
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Favorable with Amendments {318271/1 45
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Committee Amendment Adopted 45
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted 45
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Reilly) {823521/1 Rejected (10-36) 45
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 47
House 3/20/2015 3/18/2015 First Reading Judiciary 48
House 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable with Amendments {572514/1 Report Adopted 60
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (89-51) 63
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Senate Concur - House Amendments 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Passed Enrolled 61
Post Passage 5/26/2015 5/22/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Senate 1/20/2016 1/13/2016 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Senate 1/21/2016 1/21/2016 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 2/5/2016 (Senator Jennings) Rejected
Senate 1/21/2016 1/21/2016 Veto overridden (32-14)
House 1/21/2016 1/21/2016 Veto overridden (89-52)
Post Passage 1/21/2016 1/21/2016 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 5 of 2016
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-102, 12-103, 12-104, 12-212, 12-312 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM