Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Open Meetings Act - Requirements for Agendas
Sponsored by
Senators Bates, Cassilly, Eckardt, Kelley, Ready, Salling, Serafini, and Waugh
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a public body to make available an agenda, before meeting in open session, containing known items of business or topics to be discussed at the open portion of a meeting and whether a portion of the meeting may be closed; providing that specified information does not need to be included on the agenda; authorizing methods by which a public body may make available the agenda; and authorizing a public body, under specified circumstances, to make available an agenda of the meeting within a reasonable time after the meeting occurs; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0879 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {994135/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments {994135/1 Report Adopted 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 68
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM